Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1513 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 28692 Week
» 19748 Month
» 366172 Year
» 3393025 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6726 |
08/09/1961 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37026 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/3 (1)) |
37320 |
23/07/1986 |
|
TOPS (37/0 (R)) |
37026 |
06/09/1989 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
2889/D605 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
08/09/1961 to Stratford (30A) |
Withdrawn |
28/01/1999 |
Time in Service |
37 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 07/2000 |
Cut At |
English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
08/09/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
31/12/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
18/08/1978 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/09/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
31/12/1975 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
18/08/1978 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 03/1980 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/09/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6726 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2889 Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37026 |
|
|
31/12/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
18/08/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
23/07/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37320 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
06/09/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37026 |
|
|
28/01/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37026 |
|
|
07/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|