Manufacturer: Armstrong Whitworth
Builder | Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Date | 05/1930 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | K3 |
Information | 1100 Series |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1100 | 1111 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 03/1931 | 18/12/1962 | |
1101 | 1112 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 03/1931 | 04/03/1960 | |
1102 | 1113 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 03/1931 | 27/12/1961 | |
1106 | 1114 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 03/1931 | 03/07/1961 | |
1108 | 1115 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 04/1931 | 23/11/1961 | |
1117 | 1116 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 03/1931 | 05/06/1961 | |
1118 | 1117 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 03/1931 | 04/11/1962 | |
1119 | 1118 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 04/1931 | 17/12/1962 | |
1121 | 1119 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 04/1931 | 16/09/1962 | |
1125 | 1120 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 04/1931 | 19/01/1962 | |
1133 | 1121 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 04/1931 | 01/04/1960 | |
1135 | 1122 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 04/1931 | 21/07/1962 | |
1137 | 1123 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 05/1931 | 30/11/1959 | |
1141 | 1124 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 05/1931 | 16/09/1962 | |
1154 | 1125 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 05/1931 | 17/02/1962 | |
1156 | 1126 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 05/1931 | 23/08/1962 | |
1158 | 1127 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 05/1931 | 16/09/1962 | |
1162 | 1128 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 05/1931 | 31/12/1960 | |
1164 | 1129 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 05/1931 | 26/11/1962 | |
1166 | 1130 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 06/1931 | 28/03/1962 |