Manufacturer: Derby Works
Builder | Derby Works |
Order Date | 1884 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | 1667 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1667 | 1667 | MR | Johnson | 4-4-0 | 1884 | 08/1949 | ||
1668 | 1667 | MR | Johnson | 4-4-0 | 1884 | 29/08/1953 | ||
1669 | 1667 | MR | Johnson | 4-4-0 | 1884 | 10/08/1957 | ||
1670 | 1667 | MR | Johnson | 4-4-0 | 1884 | 23/02/1957 | ||
1671 | 1667 | MR | Johnson | 4-4-0 | 1884 | 28/01/1961 | ||
1672 | 1667 | MR | Johnson | 4-4-0 | 1884 | 16/12/1950 | ||
1673 | 1667 | MR | Johnson | 4-4-0 | 1884 | 19/08/1960 | ||
1674 | 1667 | MR | Johnson | 4-4-0 | 1885 | 14/01/1950 | ||
1675 | 1667 | MR | Johnson | 4-4-0 | 1885 | 04/10/1960 | ||
1676 | 1667 | MR | Johnson | 4-4-0 | 1885 | 18/12/1948 |