Manufacturer: Derby Works
Builder | Derby Works |
Order Date | 1923 |
For | 40 Steam locomotives |
Class | Compound |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
900 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 04/1927 | 14/04/1956 | ||
901 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 04/1927 | 05/1954 | ||
902 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 04/1927 | 07/1956 | ||
903 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 04/1927 | 19/08/1955 | ||
904 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 04/1927 | 07/03/1957 | ||
905 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 04/1927 | 20/11/1953 | ||
906 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 04/1927 | 07/01/1955 | ||
907 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 04/1927 | 10/1960 | ||
908 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 05/1927 | 06/07/1955 | ||
909 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 05/1927 | 07/1956 | ||
910 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 06/1927 | 06/1956 | ||
911 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 06/1927 | 11/12/1952 | ||
912 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 06/1927 | 12/04/1955 | ||
913 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 06/1927 | 11/08/1955 | ||
914 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 06/1927 | 03/09/1954 | ||
915 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 06/1927 | 12/1955 | ||
916 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 06/1927 | 22/07/1955 | ||
917 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 06/1927 | 08/12/1956 | ||
918 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 06/1927 | 08/12/1952 | ||
919 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 07/1927 | 29/01/1954 | ||
920 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 07/1927 | 13/05/1958 | ||
921 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 07/1927 | 08/11/1955 | ||
922 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 07/1927 | 11/12/1952 | ||
923 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 07/1927 | 15/10/1954 | ||
924 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 07/1927 | 23/03/1955 | ||
925 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 05/1927 | 14/11/1959 | ||
926 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 05/1927 | 03/08/1957 | ||
927 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 05/1927 | 13/07/1957 | ||
928 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 06/1927 | 22/03/1958 | ||
929 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 05/1927 | 07/1956 | ||
930 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 05/1927 | 13/04/1957 | ||
931 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 05/1927 | 11/10/1958 | ||
932 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 05/1927 | 08/1956 | ||
933 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 06/1927 | 30/04/1958 | ||
934 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 06/1927 | 23/03/1957 | ||
935 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 08/1932 | 04/1958 | ||
936 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 08/1932 | 28/01/1961 | ||
937 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 08/1932 | 19/04/1958 | ||
938 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 09/1932 | 31/07/1956 | ||
939 | Compound | LMS | Fowler | 4-4-0 | 09/1932 | 12/1956 |