Manufacturer: Horwich Works
Builder | Horwich Works |
Order Date | 1896 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 1008 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1331 | 491 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 01/1897 | 07/07/1956 | |
1332 | 492 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 01/1897 | 12/06/1954 | |
1333 | 493 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 01/1897 | 25/08/1951 | |
1334 | 494 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 02/1897 | 12/1936 | |
1335 | 495 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 02/1897 | 05/1934 | |
1336 | 496 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 02/1897 | 12/1930 | |
1337 | 497 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 02/1897 | 12/1930 | |
1338 | 498 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 02/1897 | 04/1938 | |
1339 | 499 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 02/1897 | 07/1936 | |
1340 | 500 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 03/1897 | 09/1930 | |
1341 | 501 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 03/1897 | 06/1930 | |
1342 | 502 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 03/1897 | 05/1934 | |
1343 | 503 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 03/1897 | 20/12/1947 | |
1344 | 504 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 03/1897 | 03/10/1958 | |
1345 | 505 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 03/1897 | 07/03/1953 | |
1346 | 506 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 04/1897 | 07/1937 | |
1347 | 507 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 04/1897 | 06/1945 | |
1348 | 508 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 04/1897 | 06/02/1960 | |
1349 | 509 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 04/1897 | 01/1940 | |
1350 | 510 | 1008 | LYR | Aspinall | 2-4-2T | 04/1897 | 10/1939 |