Manufacturer: Vulcan Foundry
Builder | Vulcan Foundry |
Order Date | 1943 |
For | 47 Steam locomotives |
Class | WD/8 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
8625 | 5026 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 18/11/1963 | ||
8626 | 5027 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 15/01/1967 | ||
8627 | 5028 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 05/12/1965 | ||
8628 | 5029 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 16/01/1966 | ||
8629 | 5030 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 08/05/1965 | ||
8630 | 5031 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 24/06/1967 | ||
8631 | 5032 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 12/1956 | ||
8632 | 5033 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 12/07/1967 | ||
8633 | 5034 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 23/12/1966 | ||
8634 | 5035 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 21/06/1965 | ||
8635 | 5036 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 04/10/1963 | ||
8636 | 5037 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 09/1954 | ||
8637 | 5038 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 29/12/1962 | ||
8638 | 5039 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 06/01/1964 | ||
8639 | 5040 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 13/06/1965 | ||
8640 | 5041 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 11/1949 | ||
8641 | 5042 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 10/09/1962 | ||
8642 | 5043 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 27/02/1966 | ||
8643 | 5044 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 17/04/1966 | ||
8644 | 5045 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 12/11/1962 | ||
8645 | 5046 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 05/01/1966 | ||
8646 | 5047 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 24/06/1967 | ||
8647 | 5048 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 09/1953 | ||
8648 | 5049 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 19/06/1967 | ||
8649 | 5050 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 13/06/1965 | ||
8650 | 5051 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 22/12/1962 | ||
8651 | 5052 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 02/09/1963 | ||
8652 | 5053 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 05/01/1967 | ||
8653 | 5054 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 23/01/1967 | ||
8654 | 5055 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 14/11/1963 | ||
8655 | 5056 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 21/03/1964 | ||
8656 | 5057 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 21/01/1967 | ||
8657 | 5058 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 12/1956 | ||
8658 | 5059 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 09/08/1966 | ||
8659 | 5060 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 08/1957 | ||
8660 | 5061 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 08/1957 | ||
8661 | 5062 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 26/12/1965 | ||
8662 | 5063 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 18/11/1963 | ||
8663 | 5064 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 22/04/1967 | ||
8664 | 5065 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 08/11/1964 | ||
8665 | 5066 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 21/12/1966 | ||
8666 | 5067 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 07/08/1965 | ||
8667 | 5068 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 17/04/1966 | ||
8668 | 5069 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 28/12/1963 | ||
8669 | 5070 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 09/1954 | ||
8670 | 5071 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 16/09/1962 | ||
8671 | 5072 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 09/09/1967 |