Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 33 Online
» 2715 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 2715 Week
» 137531 Month
» 340195 Year
» 3367048 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrapyard: Harry Needle Railroad Company at Kingsbury
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08239 |
30/06/1956 |
08/07/1984 |
28.041 |
11.693 |
NL |
Neville Hill |
03/1996 |
39.734 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31125 |
30/07/1959 |
12/1994 |
35.403 |
6.419 |
|
|
05/2001 |
41.822 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31168 |
04/02/1960 |
20/12/1991 |
31.896 |
9.408 |
|
|
05/2001 |
41.304 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31548 |
19/11/1959 |
01/07/1995 |
35.638 |
5.962 |
|
|
06/2001 |
41.600 |
Diesel |
BR |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
33038 |
01/06/1961 |
05/10/1988 |
27.364 |
12.742 |
EH |
Eastleigh |
30/06/2001 |
40.107 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31263 |
30/03/1961 |
10/08/2001 |
40.392 |
0.014 |
|
|
08/2001 |
40.405 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31229 |
29/09/1960 |
10/08/2001 |
40.890 |
0.014 |
|
|
08/2001 |
40.904 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31516 |
24/05/1962 |
01/10/1995 |
33.378 |
6.044 |
|
|
10/2001 |
39.422 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47971 |
29/08/1964 |
01/03/1998 |
33.526 |
3.712 |
|
|
11/2001 |
37.238 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37063 |
07/11/1962 |
31/01/1999 |
36.258 |
2.874 |
|
|
12/2001 |
39.132 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31428 |
21/07/1960 |
01/01/1991 |
30.468 |
10.962 |
|
|
12/2001 |
41.430 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47238 |
03/12/1965 |
05/10/2001 |
35.863 |
0.195 |
|
|
12/2001 |
36.058 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31282 |
07/09/1961 |
17/01/1994 |
32.384 |
7.915 |
|
|
12/2001 |
40.299 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31286 |
12/10/1961 |
20/12/1991 |
30.208 |
9.995 |
|
|
12/2001 |
40.203 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47344 |
22/03/1965 |
01/07/1999 |
34.299 |
2.630 |
|
|
02/2002 |
36.929 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47539 |
18/02/1964 |
01/09/1996 |
32.559 |
5.425 |
|
|
02/02/2002 |
37.984 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47297 |
25/06/1966 |
01/02/1999 |
32.627 |
3.285 |
|
|
05/2002 |
35.912 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47468 |
16/06/1964 |
01/08/1995 |
31.145 |
6.792 |
|
|
05/2002 |
37.937 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12074 |
30/09/1950 |
01/01/1972 |
21.268 |
30.521 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
02/07/2002 |
51.789 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37111 |
08/02/1963 |
18/09/1998 |
35.633 |
4.792 |
|
|
03/07/2003 |
40.425 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08957 |
14/08/1962 |
28/02/2004 |
41.570 |
-0.027 |
|
|
18/02/2004 |
41.542 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08625 |
31/10/1959 |
31/01/2004 |
44.282 |
0.071 |
|
|
26/02/2004 |
44.353 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37078 |
29/10/1962 |
31/01/2004 |
41.285 |
0.071 |
|
|
26/02/2004 |
41.356 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47283 |
17/01/1966 |
31/08/2004 |
38.647 |
0.082 |
|
|
30/09/2004 |
38.729 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47361 |
10/02/1966 |
31/08/2004 |
38.581 |
0.082 |
|
|
30/09/2004 |
38.663 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47634 |
14/07/1964 |
01/03/2001 |
36.655 |
3.627 |
|
|
10/2004 |
40.282 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37072 |
04/09/1962 |
31/01/1999 |
36.433 |
5.710 |
|
|
10/2004 |
42.142 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47630 |
26/09/1964 |
01/03/2001 |
36.452 |
4.460 |
|
|
08/2005 |
40.912 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20159 |
09/09/1966 |
13/09/1991 |
25.027 |
13.970 |
|
|
29/08/2005 |
38.997 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47331 |
02/02/1965 |
31/07/2005 |
40.518 |
0.107 |
|
|
08/09/2005 |
40.625 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20108 |
20/12/1961 |
13/09/1991 |
29.751 |
14.099 |
|
|
10/2005 |
43.849 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37715 |
06/07/1961 |
01/06/1999 |
37.929 |
6.463 |
|
|
11/2005 |
44.392 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37384 |
15/01/1965 |
01/12/1999 |
34.899 |
5.962 |
|
|
11/2005 |
40.860 |
Diesel |
BR |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
33023 |
28/01/1961 |
31/05/2005 |
44.367 |
0.468 |
|
|
18/11/2005 |
44.836 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47842 |
05/03/1965 |
01/02/2004 |
38.937 |
2.118 |
|
|
03/2006 |
41.055 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47838 |
05/03/1965 |
01/08/1999 |
34.430 |
6.625 |
|
|
03/2006 |
41.055 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37711 |
19/12/1962 |
01/12/1999 |
36.975 |
6.290 |
|
|
03/2006 |
43.266 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47478 |
31/07/1964 |
31/12/2005 |
41.447 |
0.329 |
|
|
30/04/2006 |
41.775 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08542 |
15/06/1959 |
31/08/2005 |
46.244 |
0.663 |
|
|
30/04/2006 |
46.907 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12098 |
23/02/1952 |
27/02/1970 |
18.025 |
36.321 |
9A |
Longsight |
06/2006 |
54.345 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08666 |
01/01/1960 |
16/01/1995 |
35.066 |
11.460 |
AN |
Allerton |
30/06/2006 |
46.526 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08449 |
28/11/1958 |
31/01/2003 |
44.205 |
3.959 |
|
|
01/2007 |
48.164 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37013 |
20/03/1961 |
16/11/2001 |
40.688 |
5.252 |
|
|
02/2007 |
45.940 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08607 |
04/07/1959 |
31/01/2003 |
43.608 |
4.079 |
|
|
28/02/2007 |
47.688 |