Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 192 Today
» 4706 Yesterday
» 21761 Week
» 12817 Month
» 359241 Year
» 3386094 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Timelines
Eastfield depot - Sunday 16/06/1968
Class |
Wheels |
Loco |
Code |
Allocation |
To Service |
Withdrawn |
Details |
Rep Num |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
D6105 |
|
|
17/03/1959 |
08/06/1968 |
Added to the dump |
|
21 |
Bo-Bo |
D6110 |
|
|
20/05/1959 |
14/04/1968 |
Added to the dump |
|
21 |
Bo-Bo |
D6115 |
|
|
02/06/1959 |
08/06/1968 |
Added to the dump |
|