Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1964 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 29143 Week
» 20199 Month
» 366623 Year
» 3393476 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #29843
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
118 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A1 |
60137 |
REDGAUNTLET |
12/07/1951 |
A1 |
60141 |
ABBOTSFORD |
17/03/1953 |
A1 |
60147 |
NORTH EASTERN |
03/12/1954 |
A1 |
60119 |
PATRICK STIRLING |
24/11/1956 |
|