Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3604 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34254 Week
» 132899 Month
» 335563 Year
» 3362416 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #5272
Type |
GNR 5,000g |
Company |
GNR |
Water |
5,000gal |
Coal |
8t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
56t 6cwt |
Wheelbase |
5' 3" + 5' 6" + 5' 3" = 16' 0" |
Wheel Diameter |
4' 2" |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A1 |
2562 |
ISINGLASS |
27/06/1925 |
A1 |
2552 |
SANSOVINO |
05/04/1929 |
A3 |
2752 |
SPION KOP |
30/06/1929 |
A3 |
2747 |
CORONACH |
10/09/1931 |
A1 |
2570 |
TRANQUIL |
06/04/1935 |
A3 |
2581 |
NEIL GOW |
15/01/1943 |
A3 |
2506 |
SALMON TROUT |
09/12/1944 |
|