"PETRO" Class 0-4-0
Class | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETRO | 15 | 01/01/1923 | W | Withdrawn | 01/01/1951 | 01/01/1951 |
PETRO | 23 | 01/01/1925 | W | Withdrawn | 01/01/1960 | 05/07/1960 |
PETRO | 24 | 01/01/1926 | W | Withdrawn | 01/01/1960 | 01/01/1960 |
PETRO | 26 | 01/01/1927 | GRA W |
Grantham Withdrawn |
17/04/1948 01/01/1960 |
05/07/1960 |
PETRO | 27 | 01/01/1926 | W | Withdrawn | 01/01/1960 | 05/07/1960 |