Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 230 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 21264 Week
» 119909 Month
» 322573 Year
» 3349426 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GCR/LNER Robinson "S1" Class 0-8-4T
GCR |
LNER (1924) |
LNER (1946) |
BR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
1170
|
6170
|
9900
|
69900
|
12/1907 |
|
06/01/1956 |
|
48.08 |
|
|
|
48.20 |
1171
|
6171
|
9901
|
69901
|
12/1907 |
|
01/01/1957 |
|
49.08 |
|
|
|
49.28 |
1172
|
6172
|
9902
|
69902
|
01/1908 |
|
13/01/1956 |
|
48 |
|
|
|
48.12 |
1173
|
6173
|
9903
|
69903
|
01/1908 |
|
08/03/1954 |
|
46.17 |
|
|
|
46.28 |