Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3218 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33868 Week
» 132513 Month
» 335177 Year
» 3362030 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1553 |
28/01/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47437 |
01/12/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
28/01/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/01/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
12/1973 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/01/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1553 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
20/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
12/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
12/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
01/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47437 |
|
|
08/12/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
07/04/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47437 |
|
|
09/07/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|