Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4413 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 25447 Week
» 124092 Month
» 326756 Year
» 3353609 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1652 |
16/01/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47068 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47632 |
05/12/1985 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47848 |
31/12/1989 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
16/01/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
01/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/01/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
05/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/01/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1652 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
19/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
14/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
12/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47068 |
|
|
02/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
09/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
05/12/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47632 |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
31/12/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47848 |
|
|