Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3696 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34346 Week
» 132991 Month
» 335655 Year
» 3362508 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1670 |
20/03/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47085 |
02/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
MAMMOTH |
08/1965 |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
20/03/1965 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/03/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/03/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1670 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
08/1965 |
Naming |
Named 'MAMMOTH' at Landore depot |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
15/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
10/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47085 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
12/06/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
09/1999 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|
18/02/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47085 |
|
|