Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1036 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31686 Week
» 130331 Month
» 332995 Year
» 3359848 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11115 |
13/11/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2214 |
22/02/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/11/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/11/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11115 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
21/07/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
22/02/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2214 |
|
|
08/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
17/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
13/07/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2214 |
|
|
08/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|