Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2584 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 28618 Week
» 127263 Month
» 329927 Year
» 3356780 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11158 |
18/05/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2239 |
21/02/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/05/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|
18/05/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11158 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
08/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
21/02/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2239 |
|
|
06/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) |
|
|
08/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
09/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selhurst (75C) |
|
|
30/09/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2239 |
|
|