Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2889 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 28923 Week
» 127568 Month
» 330232 Year
» 3357085 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11214 |
12/11/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2244 |
21/02/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/11/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/11/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11214 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to Neville Hill (50B) |
|
|
21/02/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2244 |
|
|
01/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (55F) |
|
|
29/06/1970 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2244 |
|
|
01/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by A R Adams: Newport, Gwent |
|
|