Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 34 Online
» 3681 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 8834 Week
» 143650 Month
» 346314 Year
» 3373167 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2905 |
11/06/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/06/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/06/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2905 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27756 Allocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) |
|
|
15/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
30/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wolverton Works () |
|
|
12/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
11/02/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2905 |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|