Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3053 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 8206 Week
» 143022 Month
» 345686 Year
» 3372539 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2907 |
15/08/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/08/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/08/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2907 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27758 Allocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) |
|
|
23/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (1H) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
22/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
11/02/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2907 |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|