Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4646 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 35296 Week
» 133941 Month
» 336605 Year
» 3363458 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D293 |
12/09/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40093 |
29/11/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
12/09/1960 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
02/12/1983 |
Time in Service |
23 yrs, 2 mths , 20 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 05/1984 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Information |
Power unit damage |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
12/09/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/09/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/09/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D293 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
11/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
04/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
05/06/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
29/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40093 |
|
|
08/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
02/12/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40093 |
|
|
05/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|