Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1961 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 10905 Week
» 1961 Month
» 348385 Year
» 3375238 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13314 |
03/07/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3314 |
22/02/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08244 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/07/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
03/07/1956 |
Power Unit IH3512 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/07/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13314 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
22/02/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3314 |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08244 |
|
|
04/05/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08244 from Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
19/11/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|