Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2664 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 19527 Week
» 10583 Month
» 357007 Year
» 3383860 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3814 |
26/02/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08647 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/02/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
04/1975 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/02/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3814 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Margam (87B) |
|
|
15/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08647 |
|
|
08/02/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
08/02/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
04/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (SY) |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
02/04/1997 |
Withdrawn |
|
|
|
08/1997 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by South Yorkshire Preservation Society: Meadowhall |
|
|