Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1011 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31661 Week
» 130306 Month
» 332970 Year
» 3359823 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D42 |
19/08/1961 |
|
TOPS (45/0) |
45034 |
02/1975 |
|
Departmental (Dept) |
97411 |
09/1987 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
19/08/1961 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
07/1988 |
Time in Service |
26 yrs, 10 mths , 11 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 05/1992 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over green with broad white band along lower bodyside between the cab doors. |
19/08/1961 |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and white bodyside band at base of body. |
by 31/12/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
14/11/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/08/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
14/11/1975 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
07/1981 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
04/08/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
23/03/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Cinders from steam locomotives |
Not known |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/08/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D42 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
10/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
08/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
02/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45034 |
|
|
14/11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
07/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
09/1987 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
09/1987 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 97411 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
07/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 97411 |
|
|
05/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|