Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 4430 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 25464 Week
» 124109 Month
» 326773 Year
» 3353626 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5668 |
17/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31241 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
17/11/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
01/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
31/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
01/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/1974 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/11/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
31/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
01/1972 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC, EQ Brakes |
|
|
03/1974 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
by 04/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
20/09/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5668 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 268 Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
13/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
08/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
07/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
31/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31241 |
|
|
04/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
14/03/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31241 |
|
|
05/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|