Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3256 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33906 Week
» 132551 Month
» 335215 Year
» 3362068 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6318 |
14/03/1960 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
14/03/1960 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/03/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
28/10/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6318 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27891 Allocated to Laira (83D) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
04/1971 |
To Store |
To Store at Laira (84A) |
|
|
02/05/1971 |
To Store |
To Store at Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6318 from Laira (84A) |
|
|
24/03/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|