Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 5350 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 16565 Week
» 7621 Month
» 354045 Year
» 3380898 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7076 |
03/05/1963 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
35 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
B-B |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
BP3039 |
Works Number |
7980 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
03/05/1963 to Old Oak Common (81A) |
Withdrawn |
06/05/1973 off Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
Time in Service |
10 yrs , 3 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and light green skirting, white window surrounds |
03/05/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/05/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/05/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7076 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7980 Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
18/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
06/05/1973 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7076 from Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|