Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2220 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 28254 Week
» 126899 Month
» 329563 Year
» 3356416 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D827 |
04/10/1960 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
KELLY |
04/10/1960 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
42 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
B-B |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
437 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4616 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted | Multiple Fitting | White Diamond |
|
To Service |
04/10/1960 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
01/01/1972 off Newton Abbot (83A) |
Time in Service |
11 yrs, 2 mths , 28 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,071,000 miles |
Cut Up |
on 13/10/1972 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/10/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/10/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D827, name: KELLY Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
28/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
06/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
19/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
01/01/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 827 from Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
13/10/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|