Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 802 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5376 Week
» 33334 Month
» 67976 Year
» 1289541 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9707 m/e 11/1933

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 11/1933
Withdrawal During 09/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 30 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81C Southall 4w/e 30/11/1963
83B Taunton 5w/e 24/08/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 30/11/1963
ALLOC 83B Taunton 3w/e 10/08/1964
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1933 To Service To service as GWR Number 9707
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
24/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 9707    

prev prev