Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 4079 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34729 Week
» 133374 Month
» 336038 Year
» 3362891 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12057 |
16/09/1949 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
11 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£15,411.00 |
To Service |
16/09/1949 to Toton (18A) |
Withdrawn |
25/01/1969 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 4 mths , 9 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 01/1970 |
Cut At |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/09/1949 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/09/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12057 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
09/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
27/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
31/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
21/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
18/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
01/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
12/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
09/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
17/09/1955 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Northampton (2E) |
|
|
10/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
05/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12057 |
|
|
01/1970 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|