Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2467 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33117 Week
» 131762 Month
» 334426 Year
» 3361279 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1727 |
09/04/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47135 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47664 |
11/02/1987 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47819 |
04/07/1989 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
09/04/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 05/1976 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/04/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/04/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1727 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 489 Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
20/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
24/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47135 |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
11/02/1987 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47664 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
04/07/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47819 |
|
|
01/02/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47819 |
|
|
12/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|