Manufacturer: Crewe Works
Builder | Crewe Works |
Order Date | 1949 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5MT |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
44718 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/03/1949 | 29/11/1966 | ||
44719 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/03/1949 | 30/10/1964 | ||
44720 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/03/1949 | 27/10/1966 | ||
44721 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/03/1949 | 07/1965 | ||
44722 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 30/04/1949 | 22/04/1967 | ||
44723 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 30/04/1949 | 19/10/1966 | ||
44724 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 30/04/1949 | 19/10/1966 | ||
44725 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 30/04/1949 | 14/10/1967 | ||
44726 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/05/1949 | 08/10/1966 | ||
44727 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/05/1949 | 21/10/1967 | ||
44728 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/01/1949 | 06/01/1968 | ||
44729 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/01/1949 | 08/10/1966 | ||
44730 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 28/02/1949 | 11/11/1967 | ||
44731 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 28/02/1949 | 05/1966 | ||
44732 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 28/02/1949 | 15/07/1967 | ||
44733 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 28/02/1949 | 24/06/1967 | ||
44734 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 28/02/1949 | 16/12/1967 | ||
44735 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 28/02/1949 | 03/08/1968 | ||
44736 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 28/02/1949 | 23/09/1967 | ||
44737 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/03/1949 | 14/01/1967 |