Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 1893 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J53 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
961 | 618 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 07/1893 | 01/11/1954 | |
962 | 619 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 08/1893 | 09/12/1955 | |
963 | 623 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 08/1893 | 23/01/1952 | |
964 | 627 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 10/1893 | 08/1939 | |
965 | 629 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 11/1893 | 04/12/1950 | |
966 | 630 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 12/1893 | 25/10/1957 | |
967 | 636 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 12/1893 | 23/09/1955 | |
968 | 640 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 01/1894 | 05/08/1953 | |
969 | 643 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 02/1894 | 10/10/1955 | |
970 | 647 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 03/1894 | 06/09/1954 |