Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 1917 |
For | 12 Steam locomotives |
Class | 944 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
944 | 21480 | 944 | CR | Pickersgill | 4-6-2T | 03/1917 | 31/03/1952 | |
945 | 21481 | 944 | CR | Pickersgill | 4-6-2T | 03/1917 | 18/12/1948 | |
946 | 21482 | 944 | CR | Pickersgill | 4-6-2T | 01/1917 | 03/1952 | |
947 | 21483 | 944 | CR | Pickersgill | 4-6-2T | 01/1917 | 30/06/1951 | |
948 | 21484 | 944 | CR | Pickersgill | 4-6-2T | 01/1917 | 09/1949 | |
949 | 21485 | 944 | CR | Pickersgill | 4-6-2T | 01/1917 | 12/1948 | |
950 | 21486 | 944 | CR | Pickersgill | 4-6-2T | 01/1917 | 07/1950 | |
951 | 21487 | 944 | CR | Pickersgill | 4-6-2T | 01/1917 | 07/1946 | |
952 | 21488 | 944 | CR | Pickersgill | 4-6-2T | 04/1917 | 05/1946 | |
953 | 21489 | 944 | CR | Pickersgill | 4-6-2T | 04/1917 | 07/10/1953 | |
954 | 21490 | 944 | CR | Pickersgill | 4-6-2T | 05/1917 | 19/02/1952 | |
955 | 21491 | 944 | CR | Pickersgill | 4-6-2T | 05/1917 | 06/06/1952 |