Manufacturer: Nine Elms Works
Builder | Nine Elms Works |
Order Date | 1899 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | M7 |
Built For | LSWR |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
22 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 01/1899 | 17/05/1958 | ||
23 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 01/1899 | 07/10/1961 | ||
24 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 01/1899 | 03/03/1963 | ||
25 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 02/1899 | 10/05/1964 | ||
26 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 02/1899 | 04/1959 | ||
41 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 03/1899 | 31/08/1957 | ||
42 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 03/1899 | 08/06/1957 | ||
43 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 03/1899 | 05/1961 | ||
44 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 03/1899 | 09/09/1961 | ||
241 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 05/1899 | 07/07/1963 |