Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1901 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 2721 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2781 | 1887 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 01/1901 | 07/06/1948 | |
2782 | 1888 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 01/1901 | 06/02/1946 | |
2783 | 1889 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 01/1901 | 15/11/1947 | |
2784 | 1890 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 01/1901 | 07/05/1947 | |
2785 | 1891 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 01/1901 | 24/04/1948 | |
2786 | 1892 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 01/1901 | 08/12/1949 | |
2787 | 1893 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 01/1901 | 02/12/1949 | |
2788 | 1894 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 01/1901 | 18/06/1947 | |
2789 | 1895 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 02/1901 | 09/05/1949 | |
2790 | 1896 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 02/1901 | 05/06/1950 | |
2791 | 1897 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 02/1901 | 10/04/1950 | |
2792 | 1898 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 02/1901 | 01/06/1950 | |
2793 | 1899 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 02/1901 | 17/01/1948 | |
2794 | 1900 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 02/1901 | 30/11/1949 | |
2795 | 1901 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 02/1901 | 25/01/1949 | |
2796 | 1902 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 02/1901 | 03/11/1945 | |
2797 | 1903 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 03/1901 | 07/06/1948 | |
2798 | 1904 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 03/1901 | 02/11/1949 | |
2799 | 1905 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 03/1901 | 10/03/1950 | |
2800 | 1906 | 2721 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 03/1901 | 03/11/1945 |