Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1907 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | Saint |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2911 | 2259 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 28/07/1907 | 03/1935 | |
2912 | 2260 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 31/07/1907 | 26/02/1951 | |
2913 | 2261 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 31/07/1907 | 10/05/1948 | |
2914 | 2262 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 31/07/1907 | 26/01/1946 | |
2915 | 2263 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 05/08/1907 | 09/10/1950 | |
2916 | 2264 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 19/08/1907 | 10/07/1948 | |
2917 | 2265 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 13/08/1907 | 10/10/1934 | |
2918 | 2266 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 19/08/1907 | 02/1935 | |
2919 | 2267 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 27/08/1907 | 04/02/1932 | |
2920 | 2268 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 03/09/1907 | 05/10/1953 | |
2921 | 2269 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 06/09/1907 | 08/12/1945 | |
2922 | 2270 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 08/09/1907 | 09/12/1944 | |
2923 | 2271 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 13/09/1907 | 26/10/1934 | |
2924 | 2272 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 16/09/1907 | 20/03/1950 | |
2925 | 2273 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 17/09/1907 | 03/04/1959 | |
2926 | 2274 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 26/09/1907 | 10/09/1951 | |
2927 | 2275 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 01/10/1907 | 18/12/1951 | |
2928 | 2276 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 07/10/1907 | 30/08/1948 | |
2929 | 2277 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 10/10/1907 | 20/12/1949 | |
2930 | 2278 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 09/1907 | 31/10/1949 |