Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1913 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | 45xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4530 | 2496 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 04/1913 | 17/03/1955 | |
4531 | 2497 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 04/1913 | 28/02/1950 | |
4532 | 2498 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 04/1913 | 21/02/1955 | |
4533 | 2499 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 04/1913 | 17/03/1955 | |
4534 | 2500 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 04/1913 | 17/02/1955 | |
4535 | 2501 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 04/1913 | 22/02/1955 | |
4536 | 2502 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 05/1913 | 22/04/1959 | |
4537 | 2503 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 05/1913 | 16/02/1955 | |
4538 | 2504 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 05/1913 | 20/05/1957 | |
4539 | 2505 | 45xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-2T | 05/1913 | 11/10/1955 |