Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 659 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2774 Week
» 25280 Month
» 328470 Year
» 1550035 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Yorkshire Engine Company



Order Details for Lot No: YE/YE979
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Order Date 1904
For 5 Steam locomotives
Class J11

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
253 765 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 03/1904 20/03/1959  
254 766 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 03/1904 31/10/1959  
255 767 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 03/1904 26/03/1960  
256 768 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 03/1904 30/06/1961  
257 769 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 04/1904 05/10/1961