Scrapyard: Arnott Young Carmyle
Type | Company | Class | Wheels | Number when Cut | Date Built | Date Withdrawn | Service (yrs) | Awaiting Scrap (yrs) | Depot on Withdrawal | Date Scrapped | Age (yrs) | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | GNR | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61790 | 08/1921 | 03/11/1959 | 38.244 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 1960 | ||
Steam | GCR | D11 | 4-4-0 | 62676 | 08/1924 | 29/10/1959 | 35.227 | 0.299 | 02/1960 | 35.526 | ||
Steam | GCR | D11 | 4-4-0 | 62684 | 10/1924 | 29/10/1959 | 35.060 | 0.299 | 02/1960 | 35.359 | ||
Steam | GCR | D11 | 4-4-0 | 62692 | 11/1924 | 16/11/1959 | 35.025 | 0.249 | 02/1960 | 35.274 | ||
Steam | GCR | D11 | 4-4-0 | 62694 | 11/1924 | 16/11/1959 | 35.025 | 0.249 | 02/1960 | 35.274 | ||
Steam | NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 69162 | 08/1912 | 02/03/1959 | 46.575 | 0.959 | 64E | Polmont | 02/1960 | 47.534 |
Steam | NBR | D34 | 4-4-0 | 62485 | 04/1919 | 29/03/1960 | 40.984 | 0.214 | 06/1960 | 41.197 | ||
Steam | CR | 294 | 0-6-0 | 57365 | 01/1893 | 21/05/1962 | 69.389 | 0.488 | 11/1962 | 69.877 | ||
Steam | CR | 294 | 0-6-0 | 57335 | 03/1892 | 30/10/1961 | 69.671 | 1.044 | 11/1962 | 70.715 | ||
Steam | CR | 782 | 0-6-0T | 56313 | 05/1907 | 08/01/1962 | 54.690 | 1.019 | 01/1963 | 55.710 | ||
Steam | CR | 812 | 0-6-0 | 57612 | 05/1900 | 30/04/1962 | 62.000 | 0.712 | 01/1963 | 62.712 | ||
Steam | CR | 2P | 0-4-4T | 55267 | 06/1925 | 02/10/1961 | 36.323 | 1.288 | 01/1963 | 37.611 | ||
Steam | MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44256 | 07/1926 | 30/04/1962 | 35.816 | 1.041 | 05/1963 | 36.858 | ||
Steam | CR | 300 | 0-6-0 | 57654 | 07/1919 | 09/04/1962 | 42.764 | 1.099 | 05/1963 | 43.863 | ||
Steam | CR | 652 | 0-6-0 | 57642 | 06/1909 | 16/07/1962 | 53.121 | 0.830 | 05/1963 | 53.951 | ||
Steam | CR | 812 | 0-6-0 | 57571 | 12/1899 | 30/04/1962 | 62.414 | 1.041 | 05/1963 | 63.455 | ||
Steam | NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 69216 | 12/1923 | 12/02/1962 | 38.189 | 1.337 | 64F | Bathgate | 06/1963 | 39.526 |
Steam | NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 69159 | 08/1912 | 30/10/1961 | 49.241 | 1.625 | 64F | Bathgate | 06/1963 | 50.866 |
Steam | NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 69156 | 08/1912 | 12/02/1962 | 49.529 | 1.337 | 64F | Bathgate | 06/1963 | 50.866 |
Steam | CR | 72 | 4-4-0 | 54501 | 12/1922 | 11/12/1961 | 39.016 | 1.762 | 09/1963 | 40.778 | ||
Steam | CR | 782 | 0-6-0T | 56347 | 10/1912 | 16/07/1962 | 49.784 | 1.167 | 09/1963 | 50.951 | ||
Steam | CR | 2P | 0-4-4T | 55260 | 05/1925 | 29/12/1962 | 37.649 | 0.795 | 10/1963 | 38.444 | ||
Steam | CR | 300 | 0-6-0 | 57679 | 05/1919 | 29/11/1963 | 44.573 | 0.545 | 06/1964 | 45.118 | ||
Steam | GNR | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60096 | 23/02/1929 | 09/09/1963 | 34.564 | 0.767 | 64A | St Margarets | 06/1964 | 35.332 |
Steam | GNR | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60099 | 19/04/1930 | 28/10/1963 | 33.548 | 0.633 | 64A | St Margarets | 06/1964 | 34.181 |
Steam | GNR | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60101 | 04/06/1930 | 11/04/1963 | 32.874 | 1.181 | 64A | St Margarets | 06/1964 | 34.055 |
Steam | NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 65265 | 07/1892 | 13/12/1963 | 71.458 | 0.507 | 64F | Bathgate | 06/1964 | 71.964 |
Steam | CR | 812 | 0-6-0 | 57550 | 05/1899 | 29/12/1962 | 63.666 | 1.463 | 06/1964 | 65.129 | ||
Steam | NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 65344 | 12/1900 | 25/10/1962 | 61.901 | 1.641 | 64A | St Margarets | 06/1964 | 63.542 |
Steam | GNR | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60057 | 18/02/1925 | 28/10/1963 | 38.715 | 0.633 | 64A | St Margarets | 06/1964 | 39.348 |
Steam | GNR | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60087 | 14/06/1930 | 28/10/1963 | 33.395 | 0.633 | 64A | St Margarets | 06/1964 | 34.027 |
Steam | GNR | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60037 | 25/07/1934 | 12/12/1963 | 29.403 | 0.510 | 64A | St Margarets | 06/1964 | 29.912 |
Steam | CR | 300 | 0-6-0 | 57681 | 10/1919 | 11/1963 | 44.115 | 0.584 | 06/1964 | 44.699 | ||
Steam | NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 65329 | 03/1900 | 28/12/1963 | 63.830 | 0.548 | 64F | Bathgate | 07/1964 | 64.378 |
Steam | NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 65307 | 01/1899 | 28/12/1963 | 64.992 | 0.548 | 64F | Bathgate | 07/1964 | 65.540 |
Steam | NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 65285 | 11/1896 | 29/11/1963 | 67.079 | 0.627 | 65D | Dawsholm | 07/1964 | 67.707 |
Steam | NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 65251 | 02/1892 | 28/11/1963 | 71.830 | 0.630 | 64F | Bathgate | 07/1964 | 72.460 |
Steam | LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42353 | 14/06/1929 | 13/06/1964 | 35.022 | 0.258 | 09/1964 | 35.279 | ||
Steam | MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44041 | 02/1925 | 13/06/1964 | 39.351 | 0.258 | 09/1964 | 39.608 | ||
Steam | GNR | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60077 | 19/10/1924 | 13/07/1964 | 39.759 | 0.258 | 64A | St Margarets | 10/1964 | 40.016 |
Steam | GNR | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60042 | 01/12/1934 | 13/07/1964 | 29.636 | 0.258 | 64A | St Margarets | 10/1964 | 29.893 |
Steam | LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44009 | 1921 | 27/06/1964 | 0.468 | 12/1964 | ||||
Steam | MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44452 | 02/1928 | 20/06/1964 | 36.370 | 0.488 | 12/1964 | 36.858 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45498 | 04/1944 | 26/06/1965 | 21.211 | 0.304 | 10/1965 | 21.515 | ||
Steam | LNER | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60944 | 17/04/1942 | 20/09/1965 | 23.444 | 0.068 | 52A | Gateshead | 10/1965 | 23.512 |
Steam | NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64571 | 08/1918 | 23/10/1965 | 47.222 | 0.230 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | 01/1966 | 47.452 |
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73104 | 27/09/1955 | 22/10/1965 | 10.077 | 0.318 | 02/1966 | 10.395 | ||
Steam | NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64580 | 09/1918 | 15/10/1965 | 47.115 | 0.337 | 65F | Grangemouth | 02/1966 | 47.452 |
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73103 | 21/09/1955 | 22/10/1965 | 10.093 | 0.318 | 02/1966 | 10.411 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92010 | 31/05/1954 | 02/04/1966 | 11.847 | 0.203 | 06/1966 | 12.049 | ||
Steam | GNR | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60041 | 19/12/1934 | 04/12/1965 | 30.981 | 0.781 | 64A | St Margarets | 09/1966 | 31.762 |
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73095 | 11/1955 | 27/08/1966 | 10.789 | 0.386 | 01/1967 | 11.175 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45127 | 05/1935 | 19/11/1966 | 31.537 | 0.241 | 02/1967 | 31.778 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45473 | 05/1943 | 19/11/1966 | 23.532 | 0.241 | 02/1967 | 23.773 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45469 | 12/1938 | 19/11/1966 | 27.948 | 0.241 | 02/1967 | 28.189 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45162 | 08/1935 | 19/11/1966 | 31.285 | 0.241 | 02/1967 | 31.526 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45053 | 11/1935 | 19/11/1966 | 31.033 | 0.241 | 02/1967 | 31.274 | ||
Steam | LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42694 | 09/1945 | 10/12/1966 | 21.249 | 0.345 | 04/1967 | 21.595 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73072 | 11/12/1954 | 27/10/1966 | 11.885 | 0.548 | 05/1967 | 12.433 | ||
Diesel | BR | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | D2704 | 19/09/1955 | 24/06/1967 | 11.770 | 0.310 | 10/1967 | 12.079 | ||
Steam | NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 65288 | 04/1897 | 05/06/1967 | 70.184 | 0.447 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | 11/1967 | 70.630 |
Steam | LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46491 | 12/1951 | 06/05/1967 | 15.400 | 0.529 | 11/1967 | 15.929 | ||
Steam | NBR | J36 | 0-6-0 | 65345 | 12/1900 | 05/06/1967 | 66.515 | 0.447 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 11/1967 | 66.962 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61278 | 19/01/1948 | 22/04/1967 | 19.268 | 0.734 | 62B | Dundee West | 01/1968 | 20.003 |
Steam | LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46522 | 03/03/1953 | 06/05/1967 | 14.184 | 0.781 | 02/1968 | 14.964 | ||
Steam | LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43047 | 02/11/1949 | 30/12/1967 | 18.170 | 0.164 | 28/02/1968 | 18.334 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92125 | 31/03/1957 | 30/12/1967 | 10.756 | 0.293 | 04/1968 | 11.049 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92017 | 31/10/1954 | 23/12/1967 | 13.153 | 0.312 | 04/1968 | 13.466 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75058 | 08/04/1957 | 30/12/1967 | 10.734 | 0.293 | 04/1968 | 11.027 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75043 | 17/09/1953 | 30/12/1967 | 14.293 | 0.293 | 04/1968 | 14.586 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75015 | 20/12/1951 | 30/12/1967 | 16.038 | 0.460 | 06/1968 | 16.499 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75037 | 14/08/1953 | 30/12/1967 | 14.386 | 0.542 | 07/1968 | 14.929 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75030 | 15/06/1953 | 30/12/1967 | 14.551 | 0.542 | 07/1968 | 15.093 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75026 | 13/05/1954 | 30/12/1967 | 13.641 | 0.542 | 07/1968 | 14.184 |