Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2136 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 11080 Week
» 2136 Month
» 348560 Year
» 3375413 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Timelines
Stratford depot - Sunday 19/12/1971
Class |
Wheels |
Loco |
Code |
Allocation |
To Service |
Withdrawn |
Details |
Rep Num |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2216 |
|
|
05/07/1955 |
09/05/1971 |
Around the shed. - In store |
|
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2217 |
|
|
28/07/1955 |
07/05/1972 |
Around the shed. - In store |
|
23 |
Bo-Bo |
D5905 |
|
|
08/05/1959 |
14/02/1971 |
Around the shed. - In store |
|
23 |
Bo-Bo |
D5909 |
|
|
19/06/1959 |
17/03/1971 |
Around the shed. - In store |
|
11 |
0-6-0 |
12103 |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
18/06/1972 |
Around the shed. - In store |
|
11 |
0-6-0 |
12105 |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
14/01/1971 |
Around the shed. - In store |
|
11 |
0-6-0 |
12108 |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
01/12/1971 |
Around the shed. - In store |
|
11 |
0-6-0 |
12111 |
|
|
19/07/1952 |
09/05/1971 |
Around the shed. - In store |
|
11 |
0-6-0 |
12114 |
|
|
19/07/1952 |
05/10/1970 |
Around the shed. - In store |
|
11 |
0-6-0 |
12115 |
|
|
23/08/1952 |
05/10/1970 |
Around the shed. - In store |
|