Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 272 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 1113 Week
» 15049 Month
» 142492 Year
» 1807868 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1874
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6514   22/11/1930
O4 5966   15/04/1933
O4 6265   27/07/1935
O4 6354   18/12/1937
O4 6219   11/05/1940
O4 6536   07/01/1943