LBSCR/SR Marsh "C3" Class 0-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/1936 | Condemned | 2304 | COND | ||||
09/1937 | Condemned | 2305 | COND | ||||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2300 | HOR | Horsham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2301 | HOR | Horsham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2302 | NORW | Norwood Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2303 | 3Br | Three Bridges | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2306 | HOR | Horsham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2307 | HOR | Horsham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2308 | HOR | Horsham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2309 | NORW | Norwood Junction | |||
11/1948 | Condemned | 2308 | HOR | Horsham | COND | ||
01/1949 | Condemned | 32309 | NORW | Norwood Junction | COND | ||
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 32300 | HOR | Horsham | FRA | Fratton | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 32301 | HOR | Horsham | FRA | Fratton | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 32303 | 3Br | Three Bridges | FRA | Fratton | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 32306 | HOR | Horsham | FRA | Fratton | |
05/1949 | Condemned | 32307 | HOR | Horsham | COND | ||
03/05/1949 | Reallocation | 32302 | NORW | Norwood Junction | HOR | Horsham | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 32302 | HOR | Horsham | 71D | Fratton | |
08/12/1950 | Reallocation | 32302 | 71D | Fratton | 71D | Fratton | |
03/1951 | Condemned | 32301 | FRA | Fratton | COND | ||
14/07/1951 | Condemned | 32300 | FRA | Fratton | COND | ||
10/1951 | Condemned | 32303 | FRA | Fratton | COND | ||
12/1951 | Condemned | 32306 | FRA | Fratton | COND | ||
12/01/1952 | Condemned | 32302 | 71D | Fratton | COND |