CR/LMS McIntosh "782" Class 0-6-0T
CR | CR (Renum) | LMS | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
232 | 16359 | 56359 | 06/1916 | 19/05/1959 | 42.92 | 43.03 | ||||||
233 | 16360 | 56360 | 07/1916 | 23/08/1961 | 45.08 | 45.28 | ||||||
234 | 16361 | 56361 | 07/1916 | 18/11/1960 | 44.33 | 44.45 | ||||||
235 | 16362 | 56362 | 08/1916 | 04/08/1961 | 45 | 45.20 | ||||||
272 | 16363 | 56363 | 08/1916 | 25/06/1960 | 43.83 | 44.03 | ||||||
273 | 16364 | 56364 | 09/1916 | 15/12/1960 | 44.25 | 45.28 | ||||||
274 | 16365 | 56365 | 09/1916 | 15/05/1959 | 42.67 | 42.78 | ||||||
248 | 16366 | 56366 | 07/1921 | 02/11/1956 | 35.33 | |||||||
249 | 16367 | 56367 | 07/1921 | 01/02/1960 | 38.58 | 38.69 | ||||||
250 | 16368 | 56368 | 08/1921 | 04/12/1961 | 40.33 | 40.86 | ||||||
251 | 16369 | 56369 | 08/1921 | 04/11/1957 | 36.25 | |||||||
252 | 16370 | 56370 | 04/1922 | 13/02/1961 | 38.83 | 39.36 | ||||||
253 | 16371 | 56371 | 04/1922 | 20/01/1960 | 37.75 | 37.86 | ||||||
254 | 16372 | 56372 | 05/1922 | 11/05/1961 | 39 | 39.28 | ||||||
255 | 16373 | 56373 | 05/1922 | 10/10/1959 | 37.42 | 37.95 | ||||||
394 | 16374 | 56374 | 05/1922 | 10/10/1959 | 37.42 | 37.95 | ||||||
395 | 16375 | 56375 | 06/1922 | 07/08/1958 | 36.17 | |||||||
396 | 16376 | 56376 | 06/1922 | 10/03/1961 | 38.75 | 39.19 |