CR/LMS McIntosh "43" Class 4-4-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 14450 | 29D | Forfar | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 14451 | 28B | Dalry Road | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 14452 | 28B | Dalry Road | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 14453 | 28A | Motherwell | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 14454 | 29D | Forfar | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 14455 | 31B | Stirling | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 14456 | 30B | Hurlford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 14457 | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 14458 | 29A | Perth South | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 14459 | 29A | Perth South | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 54460 | 28A | Motherwell | |||
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 54455 | 31B | Stirling | 32B | Aviemore | |
14/10/1950 | Reallocation | 54458 | 29A | Perth South | 60D | Wick | |
14/10/1950 | Reallocation | 54459 | 29A | Perth South | 60D | Wick | |
21/10/1950 | Reallocation | 54458 | 60D | Wick | 60D | Wick | |
21/10/1950 | Reallocation | 54459 | 60D | Wick | 60D | Wick | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 54458 | 60D | Wick | 60A | Inverness | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 54459 | 60D | Wick | 60A | Inverness | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 54458 | 60A | Inverness | 60A | Inverness | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 54459 | 60A | Inverness | 60A | Inverness | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 54452 | LOAN | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 54457 | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | 66B | Motherwell | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 54457 | 66B | Motherwell | 66B | Motherwell | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 54459 | 60A | Inverness | 60D | Wick | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 54453 | 28A | Motherwell | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 54456 | 30B | Hurlford | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | |
21/08/1954 | Condemned | 54455 | 32B | Aviemore | COND | ||
13/12/1954 | Condemned | 54459 | 60D | Wick | COND | ||
18/02/1955 | Condemned | 54457 | 66B | Motherwell | COND | ||
14/09/1955 | Condemned | 54451 | 28B | Dalry Road | COND | ||
07/10/1955 | Condemned | 54460 | 28A | Motherwell | COND | ||
25/10/1955 | Condemned | 54450 | 29D | Forfar | COND | ||
25/10/1955 | Condemned | 54454 | 29D | Forfar | COND | ||
15/02/1957 | Condemned | 54456 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | COND | ||
08/1957 | Condemned | 54452 | 64C | Dalry Road | COND | ||
08/1957 | Condemned | 54453 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | COND | ||
28/12/1957 | Condemned | 54458 | 60A | Inverness | COND |