Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1106 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31756 Week
» 130401 Month
» 333065 Year
» 3359918 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6714 |
24/03/1961 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37014 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/7) |
37709 |
26/02/1988 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
24/03/1961 to Stratford (30A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
24/03/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
29/12/1976 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1981 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/03/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1973 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
29/12/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/1981 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6714 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
06/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37014 |
|
|
29/12/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
05/10/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
26/02/1988 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37709 |
|
|