Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 11/1920 |
For | 15 Steam locomotives |
Class | J37 |
Information | Atlas Works |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 22668 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 12/1920 | 29/12/1962 | |
72 | 22669 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 12/1920 | 28/12/1963 | |
73 | 22670 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 12/1920 | 11/02/1963 | |
84 | 22671 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 12/1920 | 19/11/1966 | |
109 | 22672 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 12/1920 | 09/12/1963 | |
110 | 22673 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 12/1920 | 22/04/1967 | |
111 | 22674 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 01/1921 | 29/05/1965 | |
171 | 22675 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 01/1921 | 29/12/1962 | |
175 | 22676 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 01/1921 | 19/11/1966 | |
272 | 22677 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 01/1921 | 17/01/1966 | |
273 | 22678 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 01/1921 | 04/09/1965 | |
299 | 22679 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 02/1921 | 29/11/1963 | |
506 | 22680 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 02/1921 | 14/10/1963 | |
507 | 22681 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 02/1921 | 29/03/1962 | |
508 | 22682 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 02/1921 | 28/10/1963 |