Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 5119 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 35769 Week
» 134414 Month
» 337078 Year
» 3363931 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #7786
Pre Grouping Company |
GNR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
94 |
Firebox Type |
Round Top |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A1 |
2564 |
KNIGHT OF THE THISTLE |
14/07/1924 |
A1 |
2567 |
SIR VISTO |
12/1929 |
A1 |
2575 |
GALOPIN |
18/06/1932 |
A1 |
2557 |
BLAIR ATHOL |
18/07/1936 |
A1 |
2581 |
NEIL GOW |
18/06/1938 |
|