Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 281 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 21315 Week
» 119960 Month
» 322624 Year
» 3349477 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #3033/24067
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
49A |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
B16 |
2375 |
|
07/09/1939 |
B16 |
2373 |
|
26/09/1942 |
B16 |
2363 |
|
27/04/1946 |
B16 |
61440 |
|
06/10/1949 |
B16 |
61475 |
|
12/02/1955 |
B16 |
61460 |
|
14/03/1958 |
|