Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 103 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 103 Week
» 21005 Month
» 21005 Year
» 1242570 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #856
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6517   18/02/1928
O4 5001   26/02/1932
O4 6253   15/05/1936
O4 6596   20/08/1938
O4 6203   01/03/1941
O4 5379   31/07/1943
O4 3713   23/03/1946